Change - Announcement Of Cessation Of Appointment As CEO, Listed Funds
23 Mar 2023
Announcement Title | Change - Announcement of Cessation |
Date & Time of Broadcast | Mar 23, 2023 12:01 |
Status | New |
Announcement Sub Title | Cessation of Appointment as CEO, Listed Funds |
Announcement Reference | SG230323OTHRLXMF |
Submitted By (Co./ Ind. Name) | Michelle Koh |
Designation | Company Secretary |
Description (Please provide a detailed description of the event in the box below) | Mr Jonathan Yap Neng Tong will relinquish his role as CEO, Listed Funds of CapitaLand Investment Limited with effect from 5 June 2023. Further details are set out in the announcement. The admission and listing of CapitaLand Investment Limited on the Singapore Exchange Securities Trading Limited was sponsored by J.P. Morgan (S.E.A.) Limited. J.P. Morgan (S.E.A.) Limited assumes no responsibility for the contents of this announcement. |
Additional Details | |
Name Of Person | Jonathan Yap Neng Tong |
Age | 56 |
Is effective date of cessation known? | Yes |
If yes, please provide the date | 05/06/2023 |
Detailed Reason (s) for cessation | Mr Jonathan Yap Neng Tong will relinquish his role as CEO, Listed Funds of CapitaLand Investment Limited (CLI) with effect from 5 June 2023. He will assume the position as CEO of CapitaLand Development (CLD) on 5 June 2023, succeeding Mr Jason Leow Juan Thong, who will retire from the role on the same date. CLD is the private real estate development arm of the CapitaLand Group. With the cessation of Mr Yap's role at CLI, Mr Lee Chee Koon, the Group CEO of CLI, will take over from Mr Yap to oversee CLI's listed funds platform directly. The CEOs of CLI's asset operating platforms in Singapore and Malaysia and its India business will report to CLI's Group Chief Operating Officer, Mr Andrew Lim. |
Are there any unresolved differences in opinion on material matters between the person and the board of directors, including matters which would have a material impact on the group or its financial reporting? | No |
Is there any matter in relation to the cessation that needs to be brought to the attention of the shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Any other relevant information to be provided to shareholders of the listed issuer? | No |
Date of Appointment to current position | 20/09/2021 |
Does the AC have a minimum of 3 members (taking into account this cessation)? | Yes |
Number of Independent Directors currently resident in Singapore (taking into account this cessation) | 6 |
Number of cessations of appointments specified in Listing Rule 704 (7) or Catalist Rule 704 (6) over the past 12 months | 3 |
Job Title (e.g. Lead ID, AC Chairman, AC Member etc.) | CEO, Listed Funds |
Role and responsibilities | Responsible for driving the growth and management of CLI's listed funds platform, the asset operating platforms in Singapore and Malaysia, as well as its India business. |
Familial relationship with any director and/ or substantial shareholder of the listed issuer or of any of its principal subsidiaries | Nil |
Shareholding interest in the listed issuer and its subsidiaries? | Yes |
Shareholding Details | Refer to Appendix |
Past (for the last 5 years) | Refer to Appendix |
Present | Refer to Appendix |